Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:59:24 (UTC).

WAGSTAFFE, MELANIE VS WAGSTAFFE, ADAM

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 WAGSTAFFE, MELANIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WAGSTAFFE, ADAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0382

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WAGSTAFFE MELANIE

Respondent

WAGSTAFFE ADAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less