This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 19:46:36 (UTC).

WAGNER RICHARD, INDIVIDUALLY, ET AL. VS WILLIAM A. MALIS, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 WAGNER RICHARD, INDIVIDUALLY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM A MALIS, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8121

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WAGNER RICHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE RL WAGNER TRUST

WAGNER RICHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROMARIC TRUST

RICHARD WAGNER INDIVIDUALLY

Defendant

MALIS WILLIAM A. AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNTER JOHN LOGAN ESQ.

TOMS ROBERT L. JR.

Defendant Attorneys

OSMAN JOEL A.

PARKER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE RICHARD WAGNER

9/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE RICHARD WAGNER

Notice - NOTICE OF JURY DEMAND

9/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF JURY DEMAND

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

3/10/2020: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

Transfer In Case Documents - TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENTS SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE - REGISTER OF ACTIONS (PAGES 1-2)

3/10/2020: Transfer In Case Documents - TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENTS SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE - REGISTER OF ACTIONS (PAGES 1-2)

RECEIPT - RECEIPT FOR RECORD (RIVERSIDE CO. - PALM SPRINGS)

7/27/2020: RECEIPT - RECEIPT FOR RECORD (RIVERSIDE CO. - PALM SPRINGS)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL

7/27/2020: Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (JOINT); Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPlaitiffs' Notice of Change of Address; Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation to Transfer Venue From Riverside Superior Court to Los Angels Superior Court and Order CCP Section 396a(e); Filed by William A. Malis, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Department Assignment for all Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate (of Counsel); Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketTransfer In Case Documents (Superior Court of California, County of Riverside - REGISTER OF Actions (pages 1-2)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint (for Breach of Fiduciary Duty); Filed by Wagner Richard, Individually (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of the Romaric Trust Dated February 15, 1977 (Plaintiff); Richard Wagner, as Trustee of The RL Wagner Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSMAN JOEL A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER, DAVID B