This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2023 at 03:06:18 (UTC).

WAFAA KASSAMANI VS M.A.C. COSMETICS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 WAFAA KASSAMANI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against M A C COSMETICS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2540

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASSAMANI WAFAA

Defendants

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

M.A.C. COSMETICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK D. AARON

Defendant Attorney

KRANZ JANNINE E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/6/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/6/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

3/7/2023: Answer

Answer

3/7/2023: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/9/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Case Management Statement

5/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 updated: Result Date to 06/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Wafaa Kassamani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant); Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Wafaa Kassamani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Wafaa Kassamani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., a Delaware corporation to Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc., a Delaware corporation to M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wafaa Kassamani (Plaintiff); As to: M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wafaa Kassamani (Plaintiff); As to: M.a.c. Cosmetics, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketAddress for D. Aaron Brock (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less