This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2018 at 05:32:52 (UTC).

VW CREDIT INC VS. JOE MAGANA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 VW CREDIT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOE MAGANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CLERK and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8023

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CLERK

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VW CREDIT INC

Defendant

MAGANA JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEMAR ROUSSO & HEALD LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Miscellaneous; REJECTED) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Order for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Application; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by VW CREDIT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less