This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 17:04:08 (UTC).

VW CREDIT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS YONG HOON LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 VW CREDIT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YONG HOON LEE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0467

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VW CREDIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

LEE AN INDIVIDUAL YONG HOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYMSZA CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

6/28/2022: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

6/28/2022: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/28/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

6/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Motion for Order Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Writ of Possession); Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VW CREDIT, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VW CREDIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant