This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2020 at 01:18:10 (UTC).

VOSS, SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP VS ACCESS HOLDCO MANAGEMENT, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 VOSS, SILVERMAN BRAYBROOKE LLP filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ACCESS HOLDCO MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1601

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP

Defendants

ACCESS HOLDCO MANAGEMENT LLC

EMBARK GENERAL INSURANCE AGENCY LLC

ALTAMONT CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC

EMBARK GENERAL INSURANCE ADJUSTERS LLC

ALTAMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYBROOKE SCOTT EVAN

Defendant Attorney

KAUFHOLD STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/7/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

7/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/26/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

2/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

10/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/13/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Access Holdco Management, LLC (Defendant); Embark General Insurance Agency, LLC (Defendant); Embark General Insurance Adjusters, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Embark General Insurance Agency, LLC (Defendant); Embark General Insurance Adjusters, LLC (Defendant); Altamont Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Embark General Insurance Agency, LLC (Defendant); Embark General Insurance Adjusters, LLC (Defendant); Altamont Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Voss, Silverman & Braybrooke LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCESS HOLDCO MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VOSS SILVERMAN & BRAYBROOKE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTAMONT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAYBROOKE SCOTT EVAN