Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 06:39:45 (UTC).

VONNELL ADAMS VS UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 VONNELL ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5029

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS VONNELL

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

SK MARKET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

CITY OF GARDENA A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

JB GARDENA MARKET INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANAREK MARTIN J.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHROEDER JEREMY J

THOMAS ALLEN

DUMONT LOUIS R.

SHIKIBU MARGARET

SALLEY ROBERT B.

CHAPMAN ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULE HEARING)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULE HEARING)

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Answer

4/20/2021: Answer

Answer

3/29/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/23/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-JURISDICTION AND INTENT

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-JURISDICTION AND INTENT

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

3/4/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Hearing05/24/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 4:31 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JB GARDENA MARKET INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Reschedule Hearing) of 04/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Reschedule Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SK Market, Inc., A California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by City Of Los Angeles, A Government Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vonnell Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SK MARKET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANAREK MARTIN J.