This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 05:51:52 (UTC).

VLADISLAVA KAPITSA VS SOPHIA ROZOV DDS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 VLADISLAVA KAPITSA filed an Other lawsuit against SOPHIA ROZOV DDS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0039

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KAPITSA VLADISLAVA

Defendants and Respondents

SOPHIA ROZOV DDS INC

ROZOV SOPHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LINDEMANN LAW FIRM APC

LINDEMANN BLAKE JOSEPH

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KAMEL BRIAN P. ESQ.

KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

1/11/2018: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) DENTAL MALPRACTICE

1/11/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) DENTAL MALPRACTICE

Separate Statement

1/7/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery

1/7/2019: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff's Further Responses to Requests for Admission, Set One, and Imposing Monetary Sanc

1/23/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff's Further Responses to Requests for Admission, Set One, and Imposing Monetary Sanc

Notice - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Imposing Monetary Sanctions in t

1/23/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Imposing Monetary Sanctions in t

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Further Responses to ...) of 01/30/2019

1/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Further Responses to ...) of 01/30/2019

Notice - Notice of Ruling re Motions to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses and Imposing Monetary Sanctions

2/4/2019: Notice - Notice of Ruling re Motions to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses and Imposing Monetary Sanctions

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/14/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/29/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEITH ROSSMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/29/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEITH ROSSMAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/29/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VLADISLAVA KAPITSA IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VLADISLAVA KAPITSA IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF WILLIAM GINZBURG, D.D.S. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/7/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF WILLIAM GINZBURG, D.D.S. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE KRISTINE M. HICKS, CSR #13634

6/14/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE KRISTINE M. HICKS, CSR #13634

Other - - Demand For Jury Trial

3/21/2018: Other - - Demand For Jury Trial

Notice - Of Posting Jury Fees

3/21/2018: Notice - Of Posting Jury Fees

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • Hearing01/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Hearing11/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Hearing10/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Hearing10/23/2019 at 13:30 PM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Filed by Sophia Rozov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Vladislava Kapitsa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sophia Rozov, DDS, Inc (Defendant); Sophia Rozov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDemand For Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sophia Rozov, DDS, Inc (Defendant); Sophia Rozov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Sophia Rozov, DDS, Inc (Defendant); Sophia Rozov (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) DENTAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vladislava Kapitsa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LINDEMANN LAW FIRM, APC 433 N. CAMDEN DRIVE, 4™ FLOOR

BEVERLY HILLS, CA 90210

VLADISLAVA KAPITSA SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CENTRAL DISTRICT g Cé 9 0 0 38; FAX Case No. |

VLADISLAVA KAPITSA, an individual,

PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT FOR

Plaintiff, DAMAGES: . | (1) DENTAL MALPRACTICE

SOPHIA ROZOV, D.D.S., INC.;& calicomih JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

WSOPH\A RozOE an

Tndwidua ]

Defendants.

Plaintiff Vladislava Kapitsa, an individual (“Kapitsa” or “Plaintiff”), hereby files this complamt agamst Sophia Rozov, D.D.S, Inc. and Sophia Rozof (collectlvely, the “Defendants’),

. \’:’ PR T f

. P & T dd AT ‘ . (I 1,1 v} . @,."U%': “art } -4 eRi