This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:53:24 (UTC).

VIVIAN ORTIZ VS MUFG UNION BANK, N.A., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 VIVIAN ORTIZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MUFG UNION BANK, N A ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3278

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ VIVIAN

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

MUFG UNION BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAURIGUE MICHAEL JOE

Defendant Attorney

HAVEL DEREK R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/11/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/9/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. (Defendant); As to: VIVIAN ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: VIVIAN ORTIZ (Plaintiff); As to: MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/13/2022; Service Cost: 115.94; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michael Joe Jaurigue (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VIVIAN ORTIZ (Plaintiff); As to: MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VIVIAN ORTIZ (Plaintiff); As to: MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VIVIAN ORTIZ (Plaintiff); As to: MUFG UNION BANK, N.A. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAURIGUE MICHAEL J.