This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 14:18:43 (UTC).

VIVIAN KHODABANDEH VS CITY NATIONAL BANK

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 VIVIAN KHODABANDEH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY NATIONAL BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, ANN I. JONES and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0000

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ANN I. JONES

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHODABANDEH VIVIAN

Defendant

CITY NATIONAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRZAYAN NATALIE

Defendant Attorney

DRITSAS WILLIAM J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/23/2021: Case Management Statement - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER) OF 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER) OF 09/16/2021

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CITY NATIONAL BANK

7/8/2021: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CITY NATIONAL BANK

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/8/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE...)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE...) OF 07/14/2021

7/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE...) OF 07/14/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Service by Mail

7/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 07/27/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT) OF 07/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF COURT'S ORDERS PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

8/2/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF COURT'S ORDERS PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/9/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement; Filed by Vivian Khodabandeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 4:29 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference Order) of 09/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Court's Orders Peremptory Challenge and Reassignment for All Purposes; Filed by City National Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 4:34 PM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Reassignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by City National Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of General Appearance on Behalf of City National Bank; Filed by City National Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:25 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 06/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vivian Khodabandeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vivian Khodabandeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRZAYAN NATALIE