This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 15:40:48 (UTC).

VIVIAN CHAN VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 VIVIAN CHAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2869

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAN VIVIAN

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/3/2022: Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/6/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

9/2/2022: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by VIVIAN CHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VIVIAN CHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., a New Jersey corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VIVIAN CHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VIVIAN CHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VIVIAN CHAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.