This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:35:12 (UTC).

VISTA NETWORK LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JOSEPH ADAMANY

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 VISTA NETWORK LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH ADAMANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0343

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VISTA NETWORK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VISTA NETWORK LLC

Defendant

ADAMANY JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/14/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/1/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/3/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Substitution of Attorney

4/14/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPROT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/20/2022: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPROT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/20/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/20/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARMEN TEMURIAN

4/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARMEN TEMURIAN

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • Hearing05/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMemorandum (CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPROT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Armen Temurian); Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vista Network LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Vista Network LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vista Network LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM