This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2020 at 07:14:44 (UTC).

VISION CAPITAL LLC VS BANK OF AMERICA N.A., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 VISION CAPITAL LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA N A . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7967

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VISION CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

M & V WEST GROUP INC. DBA IMPERIAL PROCESSING

VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG LLC

MTC FINANCIAL INC. DBA TRUSTEE CORPS

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAPHAM MARK

LAPHAM MARK W.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

1/16/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

1/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 01/16/2020

1/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 01/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/13/2019

12/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/13/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.0...)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.0...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...) OF 09/11/2019

9/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...) OF 09/11/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/16/2019

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/22/2019: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Orders, Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to File Case Management Statement, Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to Appear on December 13, 2019) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...) of 01/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions in the Amount of $150.00 Should not be Imposed for Plaintiff's Counsel's Failure to Appear on July 16, 2019 and September 11, 2019) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed f...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed f...) of 09/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vision Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vision Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vision Capital LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VISION CAPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant