Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2017 at 14:21:44 (UTC).

VIRGIL K SHEPHERD VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT OF MOTOR VEHIC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 VIRGIL K SHEPHERD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT OF MOTOR VEHIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0237

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPHERD VIRGIL K.

Defendants and Respondents

SHIOMOTO JEAN IN HER CAPACITY OF

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR

DOES 1 TO 25

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

LETTER: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

7/19/2017: LETTER: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Unknown

7/19/2017: Unknown

PETITION

7/19/2017: PETITION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/24/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less