This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 04:52:42 (UTC).

VIRAMA HOSPITALITY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TANYA ANISE SCOTLAN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 VIRAMA HOSPITALITY INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TANYA ANISE SCOTLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7199

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRAMA HOSPITALITY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA VAGABOND INN SAN PEDRO

Defendant

SCOTLAN TANYA ANISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/4/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/28/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

7/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Application for Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Virama Hospitality Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Virama Hospitality Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Virama Hospitality Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIRAMA HOSPITALITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK