This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 00:32:18 (UTC).

VIOLET VENEGAS VS JYJ ENTERPRISE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 VIOLET VENEGAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JYJ ENTERPRISE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5121

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENEGAS VIOLET

Defendant

JYJ ENTERPRISE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOO SONNY H.

Defendant Attorney

MAXWELL KELSEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/13/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

9/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/16/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Violet Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by JYJ Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JYJ Enterprise, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Violet Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Violet Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Violet Venegas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOO SONNY H.