This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 16:24:23 (UTC).

VINDRI RODRIGUEZ VS CEDAR CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 VINDRI RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CEDAR CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, JILL FEENEY, SERENA R. MURILLO and GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5198

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

JILL FEENEY

SERENA R. MURILLO

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ VINDRI

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CONTRACT DECOR INC.

CEDAR CORPORATION DBA HILL MCDONALD'S

MOES - 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASHANI JONATHAN M ESQ.

BURTON LINDSAY N. ESQ.

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D. ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIS BENJAMIN ADAM ESQ.

JENKINS MICHAEL EDWIN ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

HENKE ROBERT ELDON ESQ.

ELDER BRAD MACLEAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

5/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED- DISMISSAL ALREADY ENTERED

11/1/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED- DISMISSAL ALREADY ENTERED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (\ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONA...)

10/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (\ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (\ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONA...) OF 10/21/2022]

10/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (\ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONA...) OF 10/21/2022]

Request for Dismissal

7/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)

7/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...) OF 05/24/2022

5/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...) OF 05/24/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...)

5/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; PURSUANT TO "...)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONDITIONAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION

5/4/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONDITIONAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN OR...)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN OR...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL BECAUSE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS CURRENTLY ENGAGED IN TRIAL, AND A REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL MANDATOR

2/23/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL BECAUSE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS CURRENTLY ENGAGED IN TRIAL, AND A REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL MANDATOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTI...)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTI...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN PARTIES) FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM

2/16/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN PARTIES) FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTI...)

6/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION (STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTI...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ( STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTIES) FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/3/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ( STIPULATED BETWEEN ALL PARTIES) FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/2/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Already Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered- Dismissal Already Entered; As To Parties changed from Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant) to Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Contract Decor Inc. on 01/19/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Contract Decor Inc. as to Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Contract Decor Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Contract Decor Inc. on 01/19/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice, pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court - Rule 3.1385(c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (\ Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditiona...) of 10/21/2022]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (\ Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditiona...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional Notice as to the Entire Action Filed 05/04/2022 scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 10/21/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive (Cross-Defendant): Organization Name changed from Moes - through 100, inclusive to Moes - 1 through 100, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by VINDRI RODRIGUEZ on 06/15/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Vindri Rodriguez as to Contract Decor Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Vindri Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Motion for Leave 12/06/17 at 1:30 pm Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDocument:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketDocument:Association of Attorney Filed by: Associated Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 11/29/18 at 10:00 am Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 12/17/18 at 8:30 am Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 06/15/20 at 8:30 am Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5198    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 29

Rodriguez v. Cedar Corp.

Motion by Defendant, Contract Décor, Inc (Doe 1), Contesting the Good Faith Settlement Between Plaintiff, Vindri Rodriguez, and Defendant, Cedar Corporation dba McDonald’s #2963 is DENIED. The Court approves the settlement pursuant to section 877.6(a)(2) of the Code of Civil Procedure.

1/17/2020, Cedar Corporation (“McDonald’s”) filed an Amended Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, indicating it settled with Plaintiff for $275,000.00. Defendant Contract Décor, Inc. (“Décor”), filed this motion to contest settlement.

The burden of establishing that a settlement was not made in good faith falls on the contesting party, Décor. (Cal. Code Civ. Proc. ; 877.6(d); L. C. Rudd & Son, Inc. v. Superior Court (1997) 52 Cal.App.4th 742, 748.) The settling party, McDonald’s, need only demonstrate that a settlement has been made. The burden shifts to the contesting party to demonstrate that the settlement does not meet the relevant factors for determination of good faith settlement under Tech-Bilt v. Inc. v. Woodward Clyde Associates (1985) 38 Cal.3d 488. (City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal. App. 3d 1251, 1261-1262.)

The factors identified in Tech-Bilt are not to be rigidly applied. North County Contractor's Assn. v. Touchstone Ins. Services (1994) 27 Cal. App. 4th 1085, 1090. Those factors are:

1. Approximation of plaintiff’s total recovery and settlor’s proportionate liability.

2. The amount paid in settlement.

3. Recognition that the settlor should pay less in settlement.

4. Allocation of the settlement proceeds.

5. The settlor’s financial condition and insurance policy limits.

6. Evidence of collusion, fraud or tortious conduct between the settlor and plaintiff.

7. The settlement must be within the reasonable range of the settlor’s share of liability.

Determination is based on information available at the time of settlement. The settlement should not be “grossly disproportionate” to what a reasonable person would estimate the settling party’s liability to be. (Mattco Forge, Inc. v. Arthur Young & Co. (1995) 38 Cal.App.4th 1337, 1349.)

Décor has not met its evidentiary burden of demonstrating that the settlement was not made in good faith. Decor has not presented any evidence that the settlement is grossly disproportionate to what a reasonable person would estimate the settling party’s liability to be or that there is any collusion, fraud or tortious conduct between the settling parties. Nor is there evidence that would support a finding a bad faith based on any other Tech Bilt factor.

Thus, the Court denies Decor’s motion to contest the settlement.

The Court approves the settlement pursuant to section 877.6(a)(2) of the Code of Civil Procedure, and thereby determines that the settlement was in good faith. The Court’s determination shall bar any other joint tortfeasor or co-obligor from any further claims against the settling tortfeasor or co-obligor for equitable comparative contribution, or partial or comparative indemnity, based on comparative negligence or comparative fault. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 877.6(c).)

Moving party is ordered to give notice.