Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 10:53:35 (UTC).

VINCENT IHENACHO ET AL VS DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 VINCENT IHENACHO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0043

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BOTERO SANDRA

HICKS CHANTAL

IHENACHO LARRY

IHENACHO VINCENT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA INC

TATEVIK DAMADYAN

DAIMLER TRUST LEASING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DON IWUCHUKU

OGIKE METU CHIKEZIE ESQ.

IWUCHUKWU DONALD ENEBEIFE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

POGOSYAN TONY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/9/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

11/15/2018: Opposition

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/16/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

11/20/2018: Minute Order

Order

11/20/2018: Order

Order

12/5/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/5/2018: Minute Order

Special Verdict

1/28/2019: Special Verdict

Witness List

2/4/2019: Witness List

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/26/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

4/26/2019: Order - Dismissal

SUMMONS

2/9/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF TATEVIK DAMADYAN TO COMPLAINT

5/9/2017: ANSWER OF TATEVIK DAMADYAN TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/23/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 04/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Vincent Ihenacho (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • ANSWER OF TATEVIK DAMADYAN TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Damadyan Tatevik (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vincent Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Larry Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Sandra Botero (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vincent Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Larry Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Sandra Botero (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Vincent Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Larry Ihenacho (Plaintiff); Sandra Botero (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Daimler North America Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLER TRUST is a litigant