This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 22:07:42 (UTC).

VINCENT DINO, ET AL. VS PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 VINCENT DINO filed an Other lawsuit against PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0534

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DINO DEBBIE

DINO VINCENT

Defendant

PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBARDELLA STEVEN CARMINE

Defendant Attorney

SMITH NICHOLAS D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

9/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

9/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Answer

9/29/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Trial Counsel); Filed by PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VINCENT DINO (Plaintiff); DEBBIE DINO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VINCENT DINO (Plaintiff); DEBBIE DINO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VINCENT DINO (Plaintiff); DEBBIE DINO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VINCENT DINO (Plaintiff); DEBBIE DINO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant