This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 22:15:32 (UTC).

VINCE SPINOSA VS FLEXI-VAN LEASING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 VINCE SPINOSA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FLEXI-VAN LEASING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0546

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPINOSA VINCE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FLEXI-VAN LEASING LLC

PAPE' MATERIAL HANDLING INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PAPE' MATERIAL HANDLING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERRY THOMAS J. III

Defendant Attorneys

EILERT ANITA MARIE

PAINTER CHARLES STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Related Case

Answer

6/29/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

6/28/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/28/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/28/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/28/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/28/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2025
  • Hearing03/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • Hearing09/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pape' Material Handling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vince Spinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vince Spinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vince Spinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAPE MATERIAL HANDLING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERRY THOMAS J. III