This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 12:24:52 (UTC).

VILMA PORTILLO VS CHINO VALLEY REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 VILMA PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHINO VALLEY REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8449

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO VILMA

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CHINO VALLEY REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMPTON ARTHUR

Defendant Attorney

COLLINSON LISA DAWN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MARSILIO JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/9/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/9/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Demand for Jury Trial

3/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

3/9/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Demand for Jury Trial

4/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/15/2022: Answer

Request - REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

6/8/2022: Request - REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

Notice of Lien

6/6/2022: Notice of Lien

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2025
  • Hearing03/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • Hearing08/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Special Notice; Filed by: American Zurich Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Jeffrey Marsilio (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Stockwell,Harris, Woolverton & Fox to STOCKWELL, HARRIS, WOOLVERTON & HELPHREY; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: American Zurich Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant); As to: Vilma Portillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vilma Portillo (Plaintiff); As to: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vilma Portillo (Plaintiff); As to: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Vilma Portillo (Plaintiff); As to: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vilma Portillo (Plaintiff); As to: Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSILIO JEFFREY S. ESQ.