Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 04:34:31 (UTC).

VILLEDA, CLAUDIO ESTRADA VS ORTEGA, RUFINA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 VILLEDA, CLAUDIO ESTRADA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ORTEGA, RUFINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0282

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLEDA CLAUDIO ESTRADA

Respondent

ORTEGA RUFINA

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165

4/6/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

2/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/12/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/12/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/12/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/12/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Summons

1/12/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/12/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/13/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

1/13/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less