This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 04:34:23 (UTC).

VILLAREAL, GLORIA VS GARIBAY, GLADYS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 VILLAREAL, GLORIA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against GARIBAY, GLADYS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KIM, ESTHER P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1055

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KIM, ESTHER P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLAREAL GLORIA

Respondent

GARIBAY GLADYS

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/16/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - EA-200 defective

10/16/2020: Proof of Service - EA-200 defective

Minute Order

10/16/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

9/25/2020: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/28/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/28/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/28/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

9/28/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • Hearing11/06/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department M at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (EA-200 defective ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less