This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 07:20:39 (UTC).

VILLALTA, EVA PATRICIA VS MAYORGA, ALLISON DAMARIZ

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 VILLALTA, EVA PATRICIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MAYORGA, ALLISON DAMARIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLALTA EVA PATRICIA

Respondent

MAYORGA ALLISON DAMARIZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/18/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

1/22/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/22/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/22/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

1/22/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/22/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less