This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 22:32:30 (UTC).

VILLA CARRITA, LLC, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 VILLA CARRITA, LLC filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1253

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAAD SHAWKY

SAHAFI MERDAD

VILLA CARRITA LLC

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIMMEL ALAN IRWIN

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/9/2021: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

11/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

11/23/2021: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

11/23/2021: Unknown - DECLARATION RE: ADD-ON ON PETITION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/19/2021

11/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/13/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/13/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

12/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

12/15/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION); Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed order); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Submission RE: Southern California Edison Company And Edison International's Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPetition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Add-On on Petition (Of Craig A. Fligor In Support Of Southern California Edison Company And Edison International's Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 11/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Villa Carrita, LLC (Plaintiff); Shawky Saad (Plaintiff); Merdad Sahafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHIMMEL ALAN IRWIN