This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 11:01:40 (UTC).

VILETTA PAIRE VS KAREN HASPEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 VILETTA PAIRE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAREN HASPEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3177

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAIRE VILETTA

Defendants and Respondents

HASPEL TONY

HASPEL EDWARD

HASPEL ELIZABETH

HASPEL KAREN

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NELSON DANIEL L. ESQ.

NELSON DANIEL LEONARD ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BLANKSTEIN JOEL ESQ.

FREED LEESA A.

BLANKSTEIN JOEL A. ESQ.

FREED LEESA ANN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS EDWARD HASPEL AND ELIZABETH HASPEL; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

5/10/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS EDWARD HASPEL AND ELIZABETH HASPEL; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Complaint -

2/6/2018: Complaint -

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

12/8/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/30/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO CLIENT'S CURRENT VERIFIED ADDRESS OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

8/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO CLIENT'S CURRENT VERIFIED ADDRESS OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/10/2020

7/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/10/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)], MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE:

4/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)], MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE:

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FSC AND TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

1/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE FSC AND TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

11/19/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/9/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS TONY HASPEL AND KAREN HASPEL; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

6/6/2019: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS TONY HASPEL AND KAREN HASPEL; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Summons -

2/6/2018: Summons -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (for Plaintiff, Filed by Attorney Silvio Natale/Nelson & Natale, LLP) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as for Plaintiff,...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Daniel Leonard Nelson, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (as Counsel for Plaintiff); Filed by Daniel Leonard Nelson, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Service by Mail to Client's Current Verified Address of Notice of Motion and Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Plaintiff); Filed by Daniel Leonard Nelson, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Daniel Leonard Nelson, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Re Proof of Service of Notice of Motion and Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Viletta Paire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693177    Hearing Date: December 08, 2020    Dept: 29

Paire v. Haspel et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Viletta Paire, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the motion on the Plaintiff. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.