This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2022 at 16:41:02 (UTC).

VILASACK SOULIVONG VS HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 VILASACK SOULIVONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1083

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOULIVONG VILASACK

Defendants

HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC. DBA HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOBASSERI ROBERT B.

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/26/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/05/2022

10/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/05/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

9/22/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/22/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/05/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 19 - Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of 10/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Michael L. Stern

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Venue; Filed by: Vilasack Soulivong (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.