This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 01:20:43 (UTC).

VIGEN AMBARCHYAN VS 4OVER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 VIGEN AMBARCHYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 4OVER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2509

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AMBARCHYAN VIGEN

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

AA1 GRAPHICS & STATIONERY

4OVER INC.

Z AND T LLC

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AA1 GRAPHICS & STATIONERY

4OVER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIRAGOSSIAN MARIA A.

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

HENNING STEPHEN JOHN

GIRAGOSSIAN MARIA ARMANI

BAIER DENNIS MICHAEL JR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

3/17/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT 4 ...) OF 02/24/2020

2/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT 4 ...) OF 02/24/2020

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

2/14/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREOF;

2/4/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREOF;

Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/7/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT 4OVER, LLCS DECLARATION EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS

2/7/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT 4OVER, LLCS DECLARATION EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF VIGEN AMBARCHYANS ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLA

2/7/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF VIGEN AMBARCHYANS ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS ISO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLA

Separate Statement

2/7/2020: Separate Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

2/7/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATES

7/24/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT 4 OVER ...)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT 4 OVER ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION

7/25/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/31/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order -

9/6/2018: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF DENNIS M. BAIER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

4/16/2018: DECLARATION OF DENNIS M. BAIER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

Minute Order -

8/8/2018: Minute Order -

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by 4over Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 4over Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AA1 Graphics & Stationery (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vigen Ambarchyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 4over Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DENNIS M. BAIER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by 4over Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vigen Ambarchyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vigen Ambarchyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vigen Ambarchyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC662509    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 28

4 Over's Motion for Summary Judgment

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AA1 GRAPHICS & STATIONERY is a litigant

Latest cases where 4OVER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN