This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 13:34:01 (UTC).

VIERA DE ORTIZ, LUZ M. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 VIERA DE ORTIZ, LUZ M - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9878

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Conservator and Petitioner

ORTIZ EDGAR F.

Not Classified By Court

VIERA DE ORTIZ LUZ M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WASSERMAN TERRY KENNETH

Not Classified By Court Attorney

PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Counsel

10/14/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

10/14/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Citation - Issued

10/12/2021: Citation - Issued

Petition - Appoint Conservator of Person Only (Initial)

10/12/2021: Petition - Appoint Conservator of Person Only (Initial)

Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

10/12/2021: Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent)

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

10/12/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

10/19/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

Minute Order

10/20/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • Hearing03/02/2022 at 11:00 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Temp Conservatorship - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent) filed on October 12, 2021 by Edgar F. Ortiz. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of Person Only (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR