Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 14:26:33 (UTC).

VIDAL AVILA VICARIO VS JESSE CHARLES DRAKE

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 VIDAL AVILA VICARIO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESSE CHARLES DRAKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1284

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILA VICARIO VIDAL

Defendant

DRAKE JESSE CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHOU JASON

Other Attorneys

PERRY KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/3/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/9/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Jesse Charles Drake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jesse Charles Drake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jesse Charles Drake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vidal Avila Vicario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vidal Avila Vicario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vidal Avila Vicario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vidal Avila Vicario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY KENNETH