This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2020 at 19:53:59 (UTC).

VIDA NAFARIEH VS RICHARD DENNIS WILLRODT

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 VIDA NAFARIEH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD DENNIS WILLRODT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0964

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NAFARIEH VIDA

Defendants and Respondents

WILLRODT RICHARD DENNIS

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DADGOSTAR HIRAD D. ESQ.

DADGOSTAR HIRAD DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KOTHARY PRITESH S. ESQ.

MYERS JEFFREY CABOT

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 04/24/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/20/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WEST HILLS HOSPITAL BILLING DEPARTMENT COR

12/10/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF WEST HILLS HOSPITAL BILLING DEPARTMENT COR

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/12/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Association of Attorney

7/8/2019: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/22/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

9/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8

9/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

9/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

9/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

9/5/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

9/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/18/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/29/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

4/5/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/5/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Hearing10/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Richard Dennis Willrodt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Richard Dennis Willrodt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketGENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Richard Dennis Willrodt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Vida Nafarieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vida Nafarieh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700964    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

VIDA NAFARIEH,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RICHARD DENNIS WILLRODT, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC700964

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 3, 2020

Defendant propounded deposition subpoenas for production of business records and appearance on non-party, West Hills Hospital Billing Department, which has information about Plaintiff’s claimed damages. Defendants propounded two subpoenas – one on the Department’s PMK and one on the Department’s Custodian of Records. The Department failed to comply, and Defendant moves to compel compliance at this time.

The motion is denied without prejudice due to failure to file proof of personal service of the moving papers on the Department. See CRC 3.1346, which provides that all moving papers must be personally served on a non-party deponent. Defendant filed proof of service of the moving papers on Plaintiff via U.S. Mail, but failed to file any proof of service of the moving papers on the Department.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.