This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 06:09:27 (UTC).

VIDA BEJEMINO VS CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 VIDA BEJEMINO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0943

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEJEMINO VIDA

Defendants

ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorneys

HADDAD KRISTEL

MANSUKHANI ROGER MOHAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/11/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/8/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/3/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/3/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC FOX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC FOX IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/24/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

3/15/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

1/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/20/2023

1/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/20/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/19/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff); ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff); As to: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAddress for Eric A. Panitz (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff); As to: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff); As to: CONNECTED CARE RESOURCES, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ADP TOTALSOURCE DE IV, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Vida Bejemino (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less