This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 21:45:31 (UTC).

VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC VS THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1077

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORY MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAGGENHURST RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

SEMENZA LAWRENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by VICTORY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victory Management,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VALLEY CLINICA MEDICA GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAGGENHURST RICHARD