This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 14:40:41 (UTC).

VICTORIA WILSON VS I.K HOFMANN USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 VICTORIA WILSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against I K HOFMANN USA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4628

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON VICTORIA

Defendants

I.K HOFMANN USA INC.

LUFTHANSA CARGO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOON KANE

TUNYAN LILIT G.

Defendant Attorneys

GREVING BRETT CLARE

BARSANTI JASON

BERNARD CHAD DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Ruling at Initial Status Conference; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial status Conference Statement; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff); I.K Hofmann USA, Inc. (Defendant); Lufthansa Cargo Aktiengesellschaft (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Lufthansa Cargo Aktiengesellschaft (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by I.K Hofmann USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Initial Status Conference); Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 11:23 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 07/21/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victoria Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUNYAN, LILIT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOON KANE