This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 15:43:18 (UTC).

VICTORIA WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FLORAFLEX CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 VICTORIA WALKER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FLORAFLEX CORP , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WESLEY L. HSU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3584

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WESLEY L. HSU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER AN INDIVIDUAL VICTORIA

Defendant

FLORAFLEX CORP. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOSRATI OMID

Defendant Attorney

ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

1/28/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Wesley L. Hsu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FLORAFLEX Corp., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FLORAFLEX Corp., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTORIA WALKER, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORAFLEX CORP. is a litigant