This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 01:16:28 (UTC).

VICTORIA SHEPHERD VS NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 VICTORIA SHEPHERD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0471

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPHERD VICTORIA

Defendants

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

NEWREZ LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Declaration - VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/13/2022: Declaration - VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/13/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTORIA SHEPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketVerification of Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by VICTORIA SHEPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTORIA SHEPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTORIA SHEPHERD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC D/B/A/ SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.