This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 17:52:34 (UTC).

VICTORIA MAGDALENA RIVERA VS NUMERO UNO AQUISITIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 VICTORIA MAGDALENA RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NUMERO UNO AQUISITIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9504

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA VICTORIA MAGDALENA

Defendant

NUMERO UNO AQUISITIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RABI JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

LEON LUCIO OCEGUEDA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/29/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

8/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2024
  • Hearing08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant); As to: Victoria Magdalena Rivera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Victoria Magdalena Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 09/07/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Victoria Magdalena Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victoria Magdalena Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Victoria Magdalena Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Numero Uno Aquisitions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NUMERO UNO ACQUISITIONS LLC DBA NUMERO UNO MARKETS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rabi, Justin