Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 06:26:41 (UTC).

VICTORIA LEONARD VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 VICTORIA LEONARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2858

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONARD VICTORIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

RASIEWICZ MARIA

RASIEWICZ ZYGMUNT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Defendants and Defendants

RASIEWICZ MARIA

RASIEWICZ ZYGMUNT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW I.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

AUSTIN TODD MICHAEL

SCHMIDT CHRISTINA PATRIZIA

CLINTON DAVID A.

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

6/11/2021: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/14/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/9/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/9/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

3/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/25/2021: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint (OR LEA VE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT;); Filed by Zygmunt Rasiewicz (Defendant); Maria Rasiewicz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Zygmunt Rasiewicz (Defendant); Maria Rasiewicz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victoria Leonard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMIDT CHRISTINA PATRIZIA