Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 11:43:23 (UTC).

VICTORIA EVA ZSIGMOND VS BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 VICTORIA EVA ZSIGMOND filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1015

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZSIGMOND VICTORIA EVA

Defendant

BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLMER LILIT

Defendant Attorneys

KOEGLE BRIAN EDWARD

KOEGLE BRIAN E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/14/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Settlement

1/28/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/29/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -1ST

9/27/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT -1ST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)

9/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)

Notice - NOTICE STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION

9/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION

Answer

8/1/2019: Answer

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

8/8/2019: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIT SOLMER

8/8/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIT SOLMER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE;)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE;)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/26/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/17/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

6/17/2019: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • Hearing03/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:51 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: notice of settlement;) of 01/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: notice of settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Best Friends Animal Society (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Best Friends Animal Society (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Leave to Amend (Complaint); Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Best Friends Animal Society (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Lilit Solmer (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victoria Eva Zsigmond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOEGLE BRIAN EDWARD