This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 20:12:41 (UTC).

VICTOR ROSAS VS CYNTHIA YAO HO

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 VICTOR ROSAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CYNTHIA YAO HO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6279

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSAS VICTOR

Defendant

HO CYNTHIA YAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2024
  • Hearing12/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victor Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Victor Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victor Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E