This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 02:35:04 (UTC).

VICTOR NAVARRETE VS LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 VICTOR NAVARRETE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6196

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRETE VICTOR AKA VANESSA NAVARRETE

Defendants

LYNEER SEARCH GROUP

LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS

LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS LLC

EMPLOYER HR LLC

YUSEN LOGISTICS

DOE JANE

RODAS HENRY

LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS - CARSON

YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC.

GARCIA YAHAIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

COOPER STACEY

ELIAS VIVIAN

JOHNSON BETSY

WHITMAN CHARLES FLINT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

8/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/25/2021

Answer

2/9/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/21/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

4/28/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reSubmission of Joint Status Report) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 2:35 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 05/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Henry Rodas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victor Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYER HR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LYNEER STAFFING SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant