This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 05:24:37 (UTC).

VICTOR MATHIS VS SPEEDY CASH, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 VICTOR MATHIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SPEEDY CASH, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1696

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHIS VICTOR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SPEEDY CASH A CORPORATION

CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP. A CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN WILLIAM WARREN

Defendant Attorney

IZURIETA JACQUELINE INEZ

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCT OF DOCUMENTS

2/5/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCT OF DOCUMENTS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESP TO FORM ROGGS

2/5/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESP TO FORM ROGGS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S SPECIAL ROGGS RESPONSE FROM SPEEDY CASH

2/5/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S SPECIAL ROGGS RESPONSE FROM SPEEDY CASH

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESP TO SPECIAL ROGGS

2/5/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESP TO SPECIAL ROGGS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POD

3/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POD

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPROGS

3/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPROGS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/10/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Cross-Complaint

10/8/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

9/24/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

PI General Order

9/8/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/20/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POD); Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPROGS); Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. O'SULLIVAN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FROGS); Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SPEEDY CASH, a Corporation (Defendant); CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SPEEDY CASH, a Corporation (Defendant); CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SPEEDY CASH, a Corporation (Defendant); CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTOR MATHIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SPEEDY FUEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN WILLIAM WARREN