This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2020 at 01:07:31 (UTC).

VICTOR MANUEL CERVANTES VS OVERTON MOORE PROPERTIES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 VICTOR MANUEL CERVANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OVERTON MOORE PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, MARK C. KIM and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0685

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

MARK C. KIM

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

CERVANTES VICTOR MANUEL

RUSHER AIR CONDITIONING

1 THROUGH 50 ZOES

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BLACKROCK REALTY ADVISORS INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

OVERTON MOORE PROPERTIES

1 THROUGH 50 ZOES

PORT LA DISTRIBUTION CENTER II LP

PORT LA DISTRIBUTION CENTER II LP [DOE 1]

RUSHER AIR CONDITIONING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN ANDREW

FRIEDMAN ANDREW ESQ.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDMAN ANDREW ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GONZALEZ NOELLE D.

GALLAGHER MICHAEL

FRIEDMAN ANDREW

Cross Defendant Attorney

EBNER DARREN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/2/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JERRI L. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MSA

12/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JERRI L. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MSA

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YAOZHI BILL YE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT PORT LA DISTRIBUTION CENTER II, LPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YAOZHI BILL YE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT PORT LA DISTRIBUTION CENTER II, LPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KELLEY E. HARMAN IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KELLEY E. HARMAN IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STACEY JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MSA

9/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STACEY JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MSA

Answer

2/4/2019: Answer

Answer

2/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/17/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

4/17/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/11/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 3:01 PM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:48 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Blackrock Realty Advisors Inc. (Defendant); Overton Moore Properties (Defendant); Port La Distribution Center II, LP [Doe 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Port La Distribution Center II, LP (Cross-Complainant); Blackrock Realty Advisors Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Overton Moore Properties (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Blackrock Realty Advisors Inc. (Defendant); Overton Moore Properties (Defendant); Port La Distribution Center II, LP [Doe 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Port La Distribution Center II, LP (Cross-Complainant); Blackrock Realty Advisors Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Overton Moore Properties (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Port La Distribution Center II, LP [Doe 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Blackrock Realty Advisors Inc. (Defendant); Overton Moore Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Victor Manuel Cervantes (Plaintiff); Port La Distribution Center II, LP [Doe 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victor Manuel Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700685    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

VICTOR MANUEL CERVANTES,

Plaintiff,

v.

OVERTON MOORE PROPERTIES , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC700685

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE SOUTH DISTRICT, JUDGE KIM presiding in DEPT. S27 of the LONG BEACH Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: December 13, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court