This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 11:54:49 (UTC).

VICTOR GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS ADB GLOBAL TRADE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 VICTOR GONZALEZ filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against ADB GLOBAL TRADE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, ANN I. JONES, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6984

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ VICTOR

Defendants

ADB GLOBAL TRADE LLC DBA CLASSIC STONE LLC

PACIFICA TILE & STONE INC.

GRANITE & MARBLE NATURAL STONE CORPORATION

IMPERIAL MARBLE & GRANITE INC.

CARMEL STONE HOUSE LLC DBA CARMEL STONE IMPORTS

BEST-WAY MARBLE & TILE CO. INC.

LYONS MARBLE INC.

JACOBE ENTERPRISES INC. DBA MARBLE EXPRESS

COSENTINO GROUP

IMPERIAL WHOLESALE INC.

POLAR STONE US

CAMBRIA COMPANY LLC

PARAGON INDUSTRIES INC. DBA BEDROSSIANS TILE & STONE

STONE SOURCE LLC DBA NY STONE SOURCE LLC

G & G MARBLE & QUARTZ INC.

MONT GRANITE INC.

M S INTERNATIONAL INC.

FRANCINI INC.

CONTINENTAL STONE MARBLE AND GRANITE INC.

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

METZGER RAPHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

WANG GALEN

TORRES JESUS J

ELDREDGE JONATHAN ANDREW

MORTIMER ANN MARIE

VANDENBURG THOMAS

GOLDBERG KAREN B.

POND FRANK

VINCENT SOCHIMA

DHALIWAL AMRIT

BERNARD KENNETH

COSGROVE PHILIP R.

DAAR JEFFERY J.

CARTER KIMBERLY C.

SHAFFERY JOHN HUBERT

GMELICH THOMAS P

GRAY GARY S.

HUGHES NADINE

WILLIAMS CHRISTOPHER E.

WILMERS JUSTIN R.

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

9/20/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

9/20/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT IMPERIAL WHOLESALE, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF KAREN B. GOLDBER

9/21/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT IMPERIAL WHOLESALE, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF KAREN B. GOLDBER

Opposition - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT MONT GRANITE INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH DEC. OF RAPHAEL METZGER

9/21/2021: Opposition - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT MONT GRANITE INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH DEC. OF RAPHAEL METZGER

Notice of Appearance

9/21/2021: Notice of Appearance

Opposition - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT MARBLE & GRANITE SUPPLY OF ILLINOIS, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH; DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER

9/22/2021: Opposition - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT MARBLE & GRANITE SUPPLY OF ILLINOIS, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH; DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT IMPERIAL WHOLESALE, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE TO ALLOW DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER

9/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT IMPERIAL WHOLESALE, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE TO ALLOW DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL METZGER

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

9/14/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE OR SPE...)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE OR SPE...)

Notice of Ruling

9/14/2021: Notice of Ruling

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

9/10/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

9/10/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

240 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Hearing03/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
281 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 03/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:18 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 02/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Statement of Damages; Filed by Victor Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Ana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Victor Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Ana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Victor Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Ana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Victor Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Ana Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21STCV06984 Hearing Date: October 14, 2021 Dept: 19

The Applications of Elizabeth A. Reese and Alexandra Brisky Cunningham to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. The applications are unopposed.

The Court finds that all of the procedural requirements have been satisfied.

Orders signed this date.

Counsel for Moving Defendants to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST-WAY MARBLE & TILE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACOBE ENTERPRISES INC. DBA MARBLE EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANITE & MARBLE NATURAL STONE CORPORATION is a litigant