This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 06:53:46 (UTC).

VICTOR FERREIRA VS JACKY LAM

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by VICTOR FERREIRA against JACKY LAM in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2966

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FERREIRA VICTOR

Defendants and Respondents

LAM JACKY

DOES 1 TO 10

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2018: Complaint

Summons

4/17/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

CoverSheet

4/17/2018: CoverSheet

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/11/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer

8/31/2018: Answer

Other -

8/31/2018: Other -

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/4/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Jacky Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Demand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Jacky Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jacky Lam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Victor Ferreira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence Non Service Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Victor Ferreira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Victor Ferreira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702966    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

VICTOR FERREIRA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JACKY LAM, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC702966

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 10, 2020

Plaintiff, Victor Ferreira filed this action against Defendant, Jacky Lam on 4/17/18 for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  The complaint alleges the accident occurred on 4/11/16 (complaint, ¶MV-1).  At this time, Defendant moves for judgment on the pleadings on the ground that the complaint shows, on its face, that the action is barred by the two-year statute of limitations.

Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 12/27/19.  The Court has not received opposition to the motion.  Because the complaint is barred by the statute of limitations, the motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted without leave to amend. 

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.