This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 20:26:02 (UTC).

VICTOR ENRIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL VS STEVEN LOEB, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On July 29th, 2021, Victor Enright (hereinafter, “Plaintiff”), represented by Darren M. Richie, Esq. and Steve Jang, Esq. of Dre Law, A.P.C filed a contract - professional negligence lawsuit against Steven Loeb, Rosen & Loeb, and DOES 1 to 20, inclusive for alleged legal malpractice. This case was filed in the Stanley Mosk Courthouse for the Los Angeles County Superior Courts.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleges, “Plaintiff was the owner of West American Roofing (“WAR”), a roofing company. Steven Loeb is, and at all relevant times was, an attorney duly admitted and licensed to practice law in the State of California . . . Loeb is, and at all relevant times was, a partner at Rosen. In 2017, WAR was sued by Westlake Village Marketplace (“WVM”), bearing case number LC10575 (the “WVM Case”). In mid-2017, Plaintiff retained Defendants to defend said lawsuit. Plaintiff paid Defendants approximately $25,000 for the representation. 

 

The Plaintiff further alleges, “Eventually, after trial, judgment was entered against WAR in the WVM Case. Notably, Defendants did not depose a single person nor did they designate any experts before trial. On information and belief, Defendants simply missed the deadline to designate experts, which in conjunction with not deposing anyone, severely hampered Plaintiff’s ability to properly defend his company at trial.”

 

The Plaintiff additionally alleges, “As a result of this conveyance, WVM sued Plaintiff personally in June 2020, alleging a fraudulent conveyance, bearing case number 56-2020-00542251-CU-FR-VTA (the “Fraud Case”). The Fraud Case is still ongoing.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleges, “When Plaintiff informed Loeb he had been sued personally, Loeb offered to defend Plaintiff in the Fraud Case for half his normal rate because Loeb said the suit was bogus. Defendants charged Plaintiff a one-time fee of $7,500 to represent him in the Fraud Case but again failed to provide a retainer agreement or any invoice or receipt. In January 2021, Defendants missed a discovery deadline in the Fraud Case and a Motion to Compel was filed against Plaintiff. Defendants told Plaintiff they needed more money from him to continue the representation despite previously telling Plaintiff the $7,500 would cover the entire representation.”

 

The Plaintiff then alleges, “This led Plaintiff to speak with his attorney for a different matter regarding Defendants. This is when Plaintiff realized Defendants had clearly and egregiously steered him wrong and were attempting to cover up their own mistakes. As a result of Defendants’ continual negligence and blatantly erroneous legal advice, Plaintiff has not only suffered significant financial harm but mental and emotional distress as well.”

 

There is one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, wherein it has been alleged that each Defendant has engaged in professional negligence (legal malpractice).

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to order judgment against Defendants, and each of them jointly and severally, as follows: for general damages according to proof, with interest thereon according to law; for special damages according to proof, with interest thereon according to law; and for such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7825

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENRIGHT AN INDIVIDUAL VICTOR

Defendants

LOEB AN INDIVIDUAL STEVEN

ROSEN & LOEB A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHIE DARREN M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 09:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTOR ENRIGHT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTOR ENRIGHT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTOR ENRIGHT, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rosen and Loeb is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHIE DARREN M.