This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 05:54:00 (UTC).

VICTOR ASSOULINE VS PATRICIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 VICTOR ASSOULINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PATRICIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3148

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSOULINE VICTOR

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

HYPERION UTS INC.

PATRICIA CORPORATION

TRANSUNION VAN LINES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORDICK DYLAN J

Defendant Attorneys

JENKINS MICHAEL

GHENCIU VLAD R

Cross Defendant Attorney

YEE STEVEN R

 

Court Documents

Motion for Terminating Sanctions - MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLCS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDAN

1/10/2023: Motion for Terminating Sanctions - MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLCS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDAN

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/23/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Ruling

11/4/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPON...)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPON...)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC.'S NON-OPPOSITION TO TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL

10/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC.'S NON-OPPOSITION TO TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPE...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPE...)

Notice of Ruling

9/29/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST ...)

8/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST ...)

Notice of Ruling

8/30/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO ITS MOTION TO COMPEL TO RESPOND TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

6/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO ITS MOTION TO COMPEL TO RESPOND TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. TO RESPOND AND TO

7/15/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. TO RESPOND AND TO

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. TO RESPOND TO ITS

6/20/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. TO RESPOND TO ITS

Answer

6/8/2022: Answer

Motion re: - MOTION RE: [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM ALL MATTERS SPECIFIED IN ITS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT A

6/9/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM ALL MATTERS SPECIFIED IN ITS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT A

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION DISMISSING AND STRIKING CLAIMS FROM CROSS-COMPLAINANT, HYPERION UTS, INC.S CROSS-COMPLAINT PROPOSED ORDER

6/6/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION DISMISSING AND STRIKING CLAIMS FROM CROSS-COMPLAINANT, HYPERION UTS, INC.S CROSS-COMPLAINT PROPOSED ORDER

Notice - DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

5/31/2022: Notice - DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLC'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2025
  • Hearing01/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: TransUnion Van Lines, LLC (Cross-Complainant); As to: Hyperion UTS, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Terminating Sanctions DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLCS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT, CROSS COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. DECLARATION OF WILLIAM G. SORKIN: Name Extension: DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TRANSUNION VAN LINES, LLCS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT, CROSS COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS DEFENDANT HYPERION UTS, INC. DECLARATION OF WILLIAM G. SORKIN ; As To Parties changed from Hyperion UTS, Inc. (Cross-Defendant) to Hyperion UTS, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Patricia Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/01/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Victor Assouline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Victor Assouline (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Corporation (Defendant); Hyperion UTS, Inc. (Defendant); TransUnion Van Lines, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victor Assouline (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Corporation (Defendant); Hyperion UTS, Inc. (Defendant); TransUnion Van Lines, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******3148 Hearing Date: November 2, 2022 Dept: 28

Case Name: Victor Assouline v. Patricia Corporation, et al. Hearing Date: November 2, 2022 Case No.: *******3148

Ruling on Defendant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s Unopposed Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production

Having reviewed Defendant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s unopposed Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production, the Court rules as follows.

On May 27, 2022, Defendant Transunion Van Lines, LLC served Requests for Production, Set No. One, on Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc.

Responses were due June 28, 2022. Hyperion UTS, Inc. has failed to provide timely responses. Defendant Transunion Van Lines, LLC now moves to compel Code-compliant responses and the requested production.

The Court grants the motion pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2031.300 and orders Hyperion UTS, Inc. to provide verified responses pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2031.210 and to produce the documents, electronically stored information, and/or other things requested without objections by November 12, 2022.

Defendant Transunion Van Lines, LLC requests monetary sanctions totaling $1,215.00.

The Court awards sanctions pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2023.030 (a) and Code of Civ. Proc. 2031.300 (c) in the amount of $390.00, calculated as follows:

Defendant requests $1,215.00 in sanctions based upon 7 hours of attorney’s work, at a rate of $165.00 per hour, and one $60.00 filling fee. Defendant spent 2 hours preparing the motion and estimates it will spend 5 hours reviewing the opposition, preparing a reply, and attending the hearing on the motion. The Court awards $390.00 in sanctions based upon 2 hours of attorney’s work.

The sanctions total $390.00 and are payable by Hyperion UTS, Inc. and its counsel by November 17, 2022.

Moving Party is to give notice of this ruling.



Case Number: *******3148 Hearing Date: September 27, 2022 Dept: 28

Case Name: Victor Assouline v. Patricia Corporation, et al. Hearing Date: September 27, 2022 Case No.: *******3148

Ruling on Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s Unopposed Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories

Having reviewed Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s unopposed Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, the Court rules as follows.

On April 11, 2022, Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC served Form Interrogatories, Set No. One, on Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc.

Responses were due May 13, 2022. Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc. has failed to provide timely responses. Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC now moves to compel responses.

The Court grants the motion pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2030.290(b) and orders Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc. to provide verified responses to the interrogatories compliant with Code of Civ. Proc. 2030.210 (a) and 2030.220 without objections by October 7, 2022.

Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC requests monetary sanctions totaling $1,215.00.

The Court awards sanctions pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2023.030 (a) and Code of Civ. Proc. 2030.290 (c) in the amount of $390.00, calculated as follows:

Cross-Complainant requests $1,215.00 in sanctions based upon 7 hours of attorney’s work at a rate of $165.00 per hour and one $60.00 filling fee. 2 hours were spent drafting the motions. As the motions are unopposed, the Court awards sanctions based upon 2 hours of attorney’s fees, totaling $390.00.

The sanctions total $390.00 and are payable by Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc. and its counsel by October 27, 2022.

Moving Party is to give notice of this ruling.



Case Number: *******3148 Hearing Date: August 26, 2022 Dept: 28

Ruling on Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s Unopposed Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted

Having reviewed Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC’s unopposed Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted, the Court rules as follows.

On April 11, 2022, Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC served Requests for Admission, Set No. One on Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc..

Responses were due May 27, 2022. Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc. has failed to provide timely responses. Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC now moves the Court to deem the requests for admission admitted.

The Court grants the motion pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2033.280 and deems the requests to be admitted.

Cross-Complainant Transunion Van Lines, LLC requests monetary sanctions totaling $1,215.00.

The Court awards sanctions pursuant to Code of Civ. Proc. 2023.030 (a) and Code of Civ. Proc. 2033.280 (c) in the amount of $75, calculated as follows:

Cross-Complainant requests $1,215.00 in sanctions based on 7 hours of attorney’s work, at a rate of $165.00 per hour, and one $60.00 filling fee. Attorney’s work is broken down as follows: 2 hours preparing the motion and 5 hours reviewing the opposition and attneding the hearing on the motion. As there has been no opposition, the Court awards $555.00 in sanctions, based upon 3 hours of attorney’s work.

The sanctions total $555.00 and are payable by Cross-Defendant Hyperion UTS, Inc. and her counsel by September 10, 2022.

Moving Party is to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOULINE VICTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where PATRICIA A LODGE QUALIFIED PERSONAL RESIDENCE TRUST DATED JUNE 14 2012 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEE STEVEN R. ESQ.