Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 06:19:43 (UTC).

VICTOR ARVIZU VS PAUL AZZI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 VICTOR ARVIZU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PAUL AZZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0341

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARVIZU VICTOR

Defendants

AZZI PAUL

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O

Defendant Attorney

KALTENBACH JOHN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

7/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

7/23/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

5/13/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 631

5/13/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 631

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/11/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/11/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2019: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PAUL AZZI (Defendant); TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (Demand For Jury And Notice Of Posting Jury Fees Pursuant To C.C.P. 631); Filed by PAUL AZZI (Defendant); TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PAUL AZZI (Defendant); TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICTOR ARVIZU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O