This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 13:02:40 (UTC).

VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS, ET AL. VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS, filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0329

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS ARTHUR JR.

WILLIAMS VICKY BERNICE

Defendant

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPERO SARAH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Shultz in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); ARTHUR WILLIAMS, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); ARTHUR WILLIAMS, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); ARTHUR WILLIAMS, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VICKY BERNICE WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); ARTHUR WILLIAMS, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPERO SARAH