Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 05:11:17 (UTC).

VICKEY WHITE VS GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 VICKEY WHITE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6950

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WHITE VICKEY

Defendants and Respondents

GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES INC

ENTERTAINMENT PARTNERS

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF GENE M. RAMOS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BORIS SORSHER

SORSHER BORIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

11/28/2018: Declaration

Case Management Statement

1/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

3/21/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SEEKING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 36

1/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SEEKING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 36

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF VICKEY WHITE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL

2/5/2018: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF VICKEY WHITE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GENE RAMOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

2/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GENE RAMOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

DEFENDANT GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

2/16/2018: DEFENDANT GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GENE RAMOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

2/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GENE RAMOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

ORDER GRANTING STO[I;ATOPM TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JIJNF 1, 2018

6/1/2018: ORDER GRANTING STO[I;ATOPM TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JIJNF 1, 2018

RULING

8/1/2018: RULING

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/18/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

5/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/2/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/7/2017: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/7/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

9/8/2017: Minute Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • Order; Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ); Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ); Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ); Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Brief (COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ); Filed by Gep Administrative Services, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Vickey White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Vickey White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC656950    Hearing Date: November 17, 2020    Dept: 19

The Hearing on Plaintiff’ Billy Richie Reyes' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Aternative, Summary Adjudication is CONTINUED TO December 10, 2020 at 8:30 A.M.

On 11/03/2020, Defendants Jeylim Rios and Jeylim Investments, LLC filed their “Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgement, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication” and their “Exhibit to Declaration of Jeylim Rios in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff’s Motion for Summary Judgement & Alternative Summary Adjudication.” However, the Court docket fails to show that the Declaration of Jeylim Rios filed in Support of Defendants’ Opposition was filed, and fails to show that any other declaration in support of Defendants’ Opposition was filed. In other words, the Court has no declarations to access for review and consideration.  Further, no courtesy copies of the briefing was provided by the parties.  Accordingly, the Court is unable to rule on Plaintiff’s “Evidentiary Objections to Declaration(s) in Opposition to Summary Judgment,” filed on 11/12/2020.

The Court orders Defendants Jeylim Rios and Jeylim Investments, LLC to file and serve a copy of the supporting declaration(s) by no later than end of business on November 25, 2020.  The Court will thereafter finalize its review of the briefing and supporting documents, and be prepared for the hearing on this matter.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEP ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENTERTAINMENT PARTNERS INC. is a litigant